Taylor v. City of Shreveport et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth W Taylor
Defendant: City of Shreveport, Virginia Hester, City of Shreveport City Court, Lee Irvin, Charles Kelly, IV, Randy Collins, Pamela Lattier and Charlie Caldwell
Case Number: 5:2011cv00317
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims filed by Virginia Hester. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/19/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 7, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 21 MOTION to Dismiss Judge Lee Irvin, Judge Charles Kelley IV, Judge Randy Collins and Judge Pammela Lattier filed by Lee Irvin, Charles Kelly, IV, Pamela Lattier, Randy Collins. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/07/12. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 17, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint; denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss Shreveport City Court. Counsel for Judge Kelly and Clerk of Court Hester are directed to contact Judge Hicks' office to discuss wheth er they would prefer to address the new allegations in the amended complaint by (1) filing supplemental briefs in support of their motions to dismiss or (2) withdrawing their original motions to dismiss without prejudice and filing new motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/17/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. City of Shreveport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Taylor
Represented By: Nelson Welch Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Hester
Represented By: Stacey D Williams
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport City Court
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Represented By: Bridget Benoit Denicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Irvin
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Represented By: Bridget Benoit Denicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Kelly, IV
Represented By: Bridget Benoit Denicola
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Collins
Represented By: Bridget Benoit Denicola
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Lattier
Represented By: Bridget Benoit Denicola
Represented By: David Glen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Caldwell
Represented By: Tom N Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?