Dickson et al v. Petrohawk Properties L P et al

Plaintiff: C Bickham Dickson, III, James Scott Dickson, Denise Merrell Dickson, Michael Robert Dickson and Addie Smith Dickson
Defendant: Petrohawk Properties L P and Sklarco L L C
Case Number: 5:2011cv00352
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Kris L. Terry. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/9/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 25, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 07/25/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
April 29, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/29/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickson et al v. Petrohawk Properties L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrohawk Properties L P
Represented By: Lawrence P Simon, Jr
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sklarco L L C
Represented By: Malcolm S Murchison
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C Bickham Dickson, III
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Andrew Durrett
Represented By: Michael Earl Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Scott Dickson
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Andrew Durrett
Represented By: Michael Earl Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Merrell Dickson
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Andrew Durrett
Represented By: Michael Earl Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robert Dickson
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Andrew Durrett
Represented By: Michael Earl Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addie Smith Dickson
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: John Andrew Durrett
Represented By: Michael Earl Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?