Lewis v. Wilkinson et al

Plaintiff: Freddie R Lewis
Defendant: Warden Winn Correctional Center
Case Number: 5:2011cv00469
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Freddie R Lewis, 43 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be denied. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter for Judge Tom Stagg on 3/11/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
August 27, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 33 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision. Magistrate Judge Hornsby's ruling is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. The court concurs with the magistrate's determination. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Hornsby's order ( 32 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/27/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)
April 1, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 25 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 24 Order on Motion to Compel. Magistrate Judge Hornsby's order [Record Document 24] is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 3/28/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 18, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion Injunctive Order; adopting 16 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the motion for injunctive order is denied to the extend Plaintiff requests unlimited access to the law library for the duration of his custody . FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for injunctive order is moot to the extent Plaintiff requests the court to order prison officials to cease and desist from interfering with his access to the law library, as Plaintiff has withdrawn this request.Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/18/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 17, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 18 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision. IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Hornsby's orders of 7/12/2011 (Record Document 14) and of 7/19/2011 (Record Document 15), are hereby AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lewis' motion for additional time in the law library (Record Document 18) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/17/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 22, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 ; Case transferred to Western District of Louisiana for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/22/2011.(mmm, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/23/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Wilkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Winn Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?