Magnolia Point Minerals L L C v. Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al

Plaintiff: Magnolia Point Minerals L L C
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P and P X P Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 5:2011cv00854
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion to compel; granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion to Produce; denying 114 Motion to Quash; denying 115 Motion to Quash; denying 119 Motion for Attorney Fees; All requests for fees, costs or sanctions in connection with the discovery motions are denied. Unless the parties otherwise agree, the deadline for compliance with this order is March 4, 2015; denying 126 Motion to Strike (which includes a request for sanctions). Plaintiff is directed to pare down its list of 19 custom and practice may call witnesses to no more than six. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/10/15.(crt,Delgado, S)
August 2, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Before the Court are cross motions for partial summary judgment filed by Magnolia Point Minerals L L C (Record Document 23) and Chesapeake Louisiana L P. (Record Document 31). This Court initially issued its ruling in favor of Che sapeake on 7/30/2012 (Record Document 53). However, in light of the Motion for Reconsideration (Record Document 56) filed by Magnolia, various briefs filed by both parties, and potential inconsistencies in relevant case law, this Court vacated its pr evious ruling and reopened the summary judgment record. The Court has now conducted a full review and consideration of all outstanding filings related to the pending cross motions, including the supplemental briefs (Record Document 78 and 80) address ing the Louisiana Supreme Courts recent decision in Clovelly Oil Co L L C v. Midstates Petroleum Co. For the reasons that follow, 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 31 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are hereby DENIED. The Lease at issue is ambiguous and there remains a genuine dispute as to the intent of the parties. Additionally, Magnolias 67 Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration is hereby GRANTED in so far as the Court has reconsidered and vacated its original ruling. It is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/2/2013. (crt,Putch, A)
July 30, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Magnolia Point Minerals L L C, 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/30/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnolia Point Minerals L L C v. Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P X P Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Karen D Ancelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Point Minerals L L C
Represented By: Frank John Reeks, Jr
Represented By: David R Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?