Slattery Co Inc v. Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al

Plaintiff: Slattery Co Inc
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P and Camterra Resources Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01399
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 196 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion to Seal Document. Accordingly, the clerk is directed to place the following exhibits under seal: Doc. 93-8, 94-5, 105-6, 119-7, 160-2, and 160-3. Pursuant to Defendants statements in its brief, the clerk is directed to unseal the following documents: 170-3, 149-4, 163-5 and 163-6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/22/14. (crt,Delgado, S)
January 6, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 87 Motion to Exclude Additional Untimely Disclosed Witnesses; granting 92 Motion to Exclude Additional Untimely Disclosed Witnesses. Plaintiffs request to modify the Scheduling Order to permit the untimely designation of additional witnesses is denied. All requests for costs and fees in connection with both motions are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/6/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 19, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/19/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slattery Co Inc v. Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: Nicole N Duarte
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Represented By: Krystal P Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camterra Resources Inc
Represented By: Joseph L Hargrove, Jr
Represented By: Glenn L Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slattery Co Inc
Represented By: Bernard S Johnson
Represented By: John B Slattery, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?