Pratt Paper (LA) L L C v. J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Pratt Paper (LA) L L C
Defendant: J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc and Travelers Property Casualty Co of America
Case Number: 5:2011cv01556
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 109 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with opposition filed by J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/06/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 29, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Travelers Property Casualty Co of America. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/29/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
January 31, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 131/13. (crt,McDonnell, D)
January 29, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/29/13. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt Paper (LA) L L C v. J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pratt Paper (LA) L L C
Represented By: Mark Ellis Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L M Advanced Technical Services Inc
Represented By: Donald J Armand, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Co of America
Represented By: Seth A Schmeeckle
Represented By: Heather N Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?