Cudd Pumping Services Inc v. Coastal Chemical L L C et al

Plaintiff: Cudd Pumping Services Inc
Defendant: Coastal Chemical Co L L C and A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2011cv01913
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying in part 130 Motion for Telephonic Oral Argument re 129 Motion in Limine; and granting in part 129 Motion in Limine. The Court grants in part the Defendant's requested relief and prohibits Kruse from making referen ce to his verification of his appraisal values through the historic data in question. The Court also agrees with the Plaintiff: because Kruse is precluded from making reference to this historic data, the Defendant is precluded from using it in its favor against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/20/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 24, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion in Limine and 38 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/22/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 9, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion in Limine; denying 46 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/9/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 15, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 25 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision; denying as moot 26 Motion to Expedite Consideration. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff's appeal and related request to present a new damage model. The Court hereby UPSETS th e current trial and pretrial conference dates. Further the Court sets a telephone status conference for 1/22/2014 at 2:00 p.m. CST. The Court's dedicated conference line will be used per the email instructions. The Court orders that Exhibit D attached to the Defendant's Response[Record Doc. 30-4] is hereby STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 1/15/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cudd Pumping Services Inc v. Coastal Chemical L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cudd Pumping Services Inc
Represented By: Michael H Bagot, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Rayer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Chemical Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?