Estess et al v. Placid Oil Co

Plaintiff: Delbert LaFitte Estess, Barbara Ellen Estess, Joann Estess Ziller L L C and Gary Noel Estess L L C
Defendant: Placid Oil Co
Case Number: 5:2012cv00052
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2016 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: The court finds that EPE's interpretation of the Placid-Smith Assignment is more consistent with the reasonable expectations and intent of the parties. Considering the importance of the interests at stake and the need for prec ision in legal documents affecting those interests, the parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed order that reflects this ruling. Any interested party or parties may also move for certificationof the issue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/26/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 28, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 77 Motion to Strike ; denying 78 Motion to Strike; and denying 79 Motion to Strike. Counsel are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Hornsby's office to set up a scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/28/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 10, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Placid Oil Co; granting 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Sur-Reply Memorandum with consent filed by Placid Oil Co. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 4/10/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estess et al v. Placid Oil Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placid Oil Co
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey D Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert LaFitte Estess
Represented By: Rudolph Estess, Jr
Represented By: Stephen M Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ellen Estess
Represented By: Rudolph Estess, Jr
Represented By: Stephen M Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Estess Ziller L L C
Represented By: Rudolph Estess, Jr
Represented By: Stephen M Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Noel Estess L L C
Represented By: Rudolph Estess, Jr
Represented By: Stephen M Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?