Gardner v. Caddo Parish et al

Plaintiff: Huey P Gardner
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish and Caddo Correctional Center
Case Number: 5:2012cv01916
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Second Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/23/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 21, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendations; denying 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/20/13. (crt,Delgado, S)
February 20, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendations and 24 Report and Recommendations re 19 Amended Complaint filed by Huey P Gardner. Plaintiff's complaint and amended complaint are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice as frivolous. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/20/12. (crt,Delgado, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Caddo Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huey P Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?