Ameri v. J C Penney Corp Inc et al

Plaintiff: Annette Ameri
Defendant: J C Penney Corp Inc, Prestige Maintenance U S A Ltd and Chartis Claims Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv02630
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court 90 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ORDER for Administrative Closure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 90 days of the signing of this Order, the parties shall submit the appropriate closing document as stated within this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 09/17/2013. (crt,Yocum, M)
August 12, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 14 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Annette Ameri re 13 Order on Motion to Remand, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/12/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
November 19, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 5 Motion to Remand. Further, Plaintiff is directed to promptly serve defendant, Chartis Claims Inc, or dismiss it if Plaintiff does not intend to pursue that defendant. Once Chartis has answered or been dismissed, the Court will promptly set a scheduling conference to discuss a trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameri v. J C Penney Corp Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Penney Corp Inc
Represented By: Richard Preston Mansour, Jr
Represented By: Daniel G Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Maintenance U S A Ltd
Represented By: James A Mijalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Claims Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Ameri
Represented By: Amy-Elizabeth Temple Brainard
Represented By: Steven Eric Soileau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?