Johnson v. Louisiana State Penitentiary

Plaintiff: Vester Johnson
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 5:2012cv02997
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 35 Report and Recommendations, denying Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 02/10/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 13, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 13 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 5/10/13. (crt,Lundy, N)
April 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Magistrate Judge Hornsby's ruling in not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Hornsby's 10 Order on Motion to Stay is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 4/10/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vester Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?