Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co v. Explo Systems Inc

Plaintiff: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co and Seneca Specialty Insurance Co
Defendant: Explo Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv03080
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Webster
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 172 Motion to Compel Answer to Deposition Question to Shelley Hopkins. Within 14 days, Shelly Hopkins shall provide plaintiffs with a verified discovery response disclosing the areas or matter that he has been designated or accepted as an expert witness in any criminal proceeding involving Explo Services or its owners, officers, or employees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/3/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 30, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 170 Motion to Compel. The motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/30/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 23, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 162 Plaintiffs' Motion to Deem Admitted its Second Set of Requests for Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/23/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 14, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 94 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/14/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 7, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 66 Order on Motion to Intervene. Magistrate Hayes' decision is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Accordingly, her decision is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 11/06/2013. (crt,Yocum, M)
May 2, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Rescission filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company filed by Explo Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 5/2/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co v. Explo Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Sidney Joseph Angelle
Represented By: Eric Blaise Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Eric Blaise Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Explo Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?