Hill v. Phan et al

Plaintiff: David Lee Hill
Defendant: Hai Phan, Unknown S P D Officer, Willie Shaw, Charles Rex Scott, Alan J Golden, Steve Prator, John D Mosely, Jr, Micheal Enwright, Gregory Scott Brady and Unknown Defendant
Case Number: 5:2013cv00583
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2016 178 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING adopting 174 Report and Recommendations; granting 171 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; vacating 175 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 12/07/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 8, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 169 Report and Recommendations; granting 166 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. All claims against Sgt. Philip Craft areDISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/8/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 5, 2016 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 114 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 116 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 136 Motion to Dismiss; granting 143 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 161 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 05/05/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 16, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 Report and Recommendations re 1 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint, 13 Amended Complaint, 21 Amended Complaint and 46 Amended Complaint, filed by David Lee Hill. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs civil rights claims seeking m onetary damages for his allegedly unconstitutional conviction and sentence be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) until such time as the Heck conditions are met. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs civil rights c laims against Charles Rex Scott, Alan J. Golden, John D. Mosely, Jr., Michael Enwright, Ross Owen, Gregory Scott Brady, Amanda Sullivan, and Mrs. Lewis be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for habeas relief be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state court remedies. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/16/2015. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Phan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hai Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown S P D Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rex Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Prator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Mosely, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Enwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Scott Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?