Morgan Jr v. Barber Examiners, et al

Plaintiff: Walter Morgan, Jr
Defendant: LA Board of Barber Examiners, LA State Association of Barbers Hair Dressers Cosmetologists & Proprietors and LA State Association of Local 496 Journeymen Barbers
Case Number: 5:2013cv00958
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Webster
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Louisiana Board of Barber Examiners MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LA Board of Barber Examiners. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/23/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 20 Motion for Relief From Judgment. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/29/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 4, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 11 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with incorporated Memorandum filed by LA State Association of Journeymen Barbers Hair Dressers Cosmetologists & Proprietors, Local 496 United Food & Commercial Workers Union. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 06/03/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Jr v. Barber Examiners, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Morgan, Jr
Represented By: Reshonda Leshay Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Board of Barber Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA State Association of Barbers Hair Dressers Cosmetologists & Proprietors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA State Association of Local 496 Journeymen Barbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?