Tate v. Leblanc et al

Plaintiff: Robert David Tate
Defendant: Angie Huff, James Leblanc and Chris Evans
Case Number: 5:2013cv01253
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 151 Report and Recommendations and denying 140 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/17/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 17, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 130 Report and Recommendations, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants' Motion 114 , be GRANTED IN PART, and that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant LeBlanc be DISMISSED, with prejudice in their entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion, 114 be GRANTED IN PART, and Plaintiff's claim for monetary damages against all Defendants in their official capacities be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion 114 , be otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 9/16/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
July 21, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/21/14. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Leblanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leblanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert David Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?