Taylor et al v. City of Shreveport et al

Plaintiff: Fred Taylor, Vickie Williams, Jessica Walker and Michael Carter
Defendant: City of Shreveport, Willie L Shaw, Jr, Duane Huddleston, David Kent and Debbie Strickland
Case Number: 5:2013cv02227
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Insofar as the motion seeks summary judgment on the Plaintiffs' Rehabilitation Act claims, the motion is DENIED. Insofar as the motion seeks dismissal of the Plaintiffs' claims under Louisiana disability discrimination law, the motion is GRANTED and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Insofar as the motion seeks to dismiss the Plaintiffs' Louisiana constitutional claims, the motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties contact chambers by 8/31/2016 to set a scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/24/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 1, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 33 Motion to Compel; denying 33 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 02/01/2016. (crt,Williams, L)
September 24, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 20 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim defendants filed by David Kent, Duane Huddleston, Debbie Strickland, Willie L Shaw, Jr, City of Shreveport. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/24/2014. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. City of Shreveport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Taylor
Represented By: Pamela Nathan Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Williams
Represented By: Pamela Nathan Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Walker
Represented By: Pamela Nathan Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carter
Represented By: Pamela Nathan Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie L Shaw, Jr
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Huddleston
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kent
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Strickland
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?