Shelter Mutual Insurance Co v. Cloud

Plaintiff: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Defendant: Christopher Cloud
Case Number: 5:2013cv02660
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 04/29/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 11, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Cloud filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co AND 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christy Hatfield. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 04/10/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
February 13, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 10 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Christy Hatfield. Hatfield's motion to intervene is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/13/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co v. Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: James R Sterritt
Represented By: Gregg A Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?