Manshack et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing L L C et al

Plaintiff: Jack M Bailey, Jr and Kimberly Manshack
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing L L C and American Security Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2013cv03231
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: The Motion to Remand (Doc. 7) in 14 CV 0759 is granted on the grounds that the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. This order is stayed until such time as the appeal 14 from the prior ruling in 13 CV 3231 and any appeal from this ruling have been decided by the district judge.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/14. (crt,Delgado, S)
March 5, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Jack M Bailey, Jr, Kimberly Manshack is granted, subject to the stay in the accompanying order. In light of this decision, it is unnecessary to address Plaintiffs argument that the removal was untimely. On remand, Plaintiffs recovery, including penalties and attorneys fees, shall be limited in accordance with their stipulation in this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/5/14. (crt,Delgado, S)
December 19, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Ocwen will be allowed until January 17, 2014 to file an amended notice of removal that addresses the issues discussed above. If Ocwen meets its burden of establishing diversity jurisdiction, a scheduling conference will be set. If not, the case will be subject to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/19/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manshack et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing L L C
Represented By: Katie Lynn Dysart
Represented By: Camalla M Kimbrough
Represented By: Kent A Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack M Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Jack M Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Heather Ruth Ray
Represented By: Travis Lucas Thaxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Manshack
Represented By: Jack M Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Heather Ruth Ray
Represented By: Travis Lucas Thaxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?