Ulrich v. Scott et al

Plaintiff: Amber Hahmer Ulrich
Defendant: Charles R Scott, Kenya Ellis, Jordan Bird, City of Shreveport and Terri Scott
Case Number: 5:2014cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 42 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Terri Scott, Jimmy N Ray, City of Shreveport, P A Lamotte. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/29/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 16, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 47 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Defendants Prudhomme, Ellis, and Bird filed by Jordan Bird, Geya Prudhomme, Kenya Ellis. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/16/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 24, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 22 Second MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Kenya Ellis and Jordan Bird filed by Jordan Bird, Kenya Ellis. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/24/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 19, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Terri Scott, City of Shreveport. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/19/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulrich v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hahmer Ulrich
Represented By: Nelson Welch Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?