Easter vs. Caldwell et al

Plaintiff: Nida Easter
Defendant: Charlie Caldwell, Jr, Willie Shaw, Robert Shemwell, Steve Prator and Cedric Glover
Case Number: 5:2014cv00967
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 42 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ollie Tyler. A judgment consistent with this memorandum ruling will issue herewith. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/26/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
October 27, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 34 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Willie Shaw; and denying 29 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Charlie Caldwell, Jr and 31 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Steve Prator. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/27/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 20, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against Chief Shaw, City Marshal Caldwell, and Sheriff Prator are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/20/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easter vs. Caldwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida Easter
Represented By: Patricia A Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Caldwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shemwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Prator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?