Omran v. Prator et al

Plaintiff: Mohamed Admed Hassan Abdallah Omran
Defendant: Steve Prator, Robert Wyche and Dinkins
Case Number: 5:2014cv02825
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 107 Report and Recommendations; denying 94 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 103 Motion for Hearing; and granting 98 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/27/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 27, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 101 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 96 Order on Motion for Extension filed by Mohammed Ahmed Hassan Abdallah Omran; 81 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 96 Order on Motion. For the reasons set forth, the Orders of the Magistrate Judge are AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/27/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 6, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 43 Order on Motion to Compel ; denying 55 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 53 Order on Motion to Compel, ; denying 78 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 60 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/5/2017. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omran v. Prator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Admed Hassan Abdallah Omran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Prator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?