Parham v. Nationstar Mortgage L L C et al

Plaintiff: Gena F Parham
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage L L C and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp
Case Number: 5:2014cv03376
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING terminating 30 MOTION to Dismiss, for administrative purposes only. Within fifteen (15) days from a final disposition in the state court case, the parties must contact the Court to schedule a telephone status conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/17/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 7, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is STAYED pending a ruling by the 26th JDC determining whether the Louisiana Code of Civil Procedure authorizes Gena Parham to assert the cla ims for relief sought in this matter in suit no. 143,494 (the foreclosure action). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall notify the court of the ruling no later than 14 days from the date of such ruling. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 12/7/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 15, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: If Plaintiffs contests the assertion that Vernon Chance was improperly joined, they must file a motion to remand, supported by a memorandum, by January 20, 2015 and explain why there is a reasonable basis to predict that state law would allow Plaintiffs to recover against Chance. If Plaintiffs timely file a motion to remand, it will be noticed for briefing so that the Defendants can respond and attempt to meet their burden on the improper joinder issue (Compliance Dead line set for 1/20/2015). If Plaintiffs do not timely file a motion to remand and challenge the improper joinder plea, the court will consider Plaintiffs to concede the point, Vernon Chance will be dismissed, and the court will set a scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/15/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parham v. Nationstar Mortgage L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena F Parham
Represented By: J Spencer Hays, II
Represented By: David A Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage L L C
Represented By: Melissa M Grand
Represented By: Jonathan G Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp
Represented By: Melissa M Grand
Represented By: Jonathan G Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?