Woodard et al v. Woodard Villa Inc
Plaintiff: Stephanie Woodard Erickson and Christopher Woodard
Defendant: Woodard Villa Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Ernest Woodard
Case Number: 5:2015cv01777
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bienville
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 90 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The parties shall submit to the Court a joint motion to dismiss, or a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties within 90 days. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/16/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/18/2018 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport Court House before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2018. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 6/30/2017. Plaintiffs' Witness List due by 12/26/2017. Plaintiffs' Expert Info/Reports due by 12/22/2017. Defendant's Expert Info/Reports due by 1/23/2018. Discovery deadline 1/24/2018. Expert Depositions due by 2/26/2018. Daubert Motions due by 3/19/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 4/5/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 4/19/2018. Motions in Limine due by 5/3/2018. Trial Depositions due by 5/29/2018. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 6/11/2018. Electronic Exhibits due by 6/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/13/2017. (crt,Leday, A)
June 6, 2017 Filing 74 RESPONSE Letter to Magistrate Hayes by Christopher Woodard re 73 Scheduling Conference,, Setting New Deadlines. (aty,Madison, John)
May 31, 2017 Filing 73 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/31/2017. After discussion, a new trial date of June 18, 2018, with a final pretrial conference on May 17, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. was selected. Counsel agreed to confer and file proposed deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions on or before June 7, 2017. Thereafter, a new scheduling order will issue. Counsel will also consult with their clients, and notify the undersigned with their available dates if they wish to participate in a mediation-style settlement conference. (jud,Hayes, Karen)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: By order of the District Court, a telephone scheduling conference is set for 5/31/2017, at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the conference call to include all counsel and the court (318-388-6036). Any party that has a preexisting conflict with the conference setting shall promptly arrange a mutually agreeable alternative date/time with all other counsel and the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/24/2017. (crt,Barkley, B)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Continue Trial. The jury trial set for 6/19/2017 is CONTINUED. This matter is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes for the selection of a new trial date. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 5/24/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 23, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #70 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial with consent. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 23, 2017 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial with consent by Christopher Woodard, Ernest Woodard and Woodard Villa Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified filers on 5/23/2017 (Bunting, M).
May 18, 2017 Filing 69 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: mooting #55 and #56 Motion in Limine; granting #57 Motion in Limine; FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/18/2017. Jury trial is set for 6/19/2017, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel should arrive 30 minutes early on the first day of trial. Stipulations, amended pretrial order, joint jury instructions and interrogatories, joint neutral statements, plaintiff's final will call and glossary to court reporter due 6/9/2017. CD of pdf of exhibits due 6/12/2017. Defendant's final will call due 6/14/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 16, 2017 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part #38 Motion for Summary Judgment. As to the limitation of Plaintiffs' claims to acts of shareholder oppression on or after January 1, 2015, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. As to the dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims, Defendant's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 5/16/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 11, 2017 Filing 67 PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER by Christopher Woodard, Ernest Woodard and Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Joint Exhibit List)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified filers on 5/11/2017 (Bunting, M).
May 11, 2017 Filing 66 WITNESS LIST filed (restricted access) by Christopher Woodard, Ernest Woodard and Woodard Villa Inc. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified filers on 5/11/2017 (Bunting, M).
May 11, 2017 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #56 Second MOTION in Limine , #55 First MOTION in Limine , #57 MEMORANDUM in SUPPORT of MOTION in Limine filed by Christopher Woodard, Ernest Woodard. (aty,Jones, Reid)
May 10, 2017 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' "Objection to Letter Dated May 8, 2017" by Woodard Villa Inc re #63 Response in Opposition (NOT Motions) . (aty,Byrd, Edwin)
May 9, 2017 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition to letter dated May 8, 2017 by Christopher Woodard, Ernest Woodard re #62 Response (NOT Motions) . (aty,Jones, Reid)
May 9, 2017 Filing 62 RESPONSE by Woodard Villa Inc Letter to Judge Foote. (aty,Byrd, Edwin)
May 8, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #57 MEMORANDUM in SUPPORT of MOTION in Limine. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 8, 2017 Filing 60 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Woodard Villa, Inc.'s Motion in Limine Regarding Testimony of Fair Market Value filed by Woodard Villa Inc regarding #57 MOTION in Limine . (aty,Wilkes, Zachary)
May 5, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #56 Second MOTION in Limine. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 5, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #55 First MOTION in Limine. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 4, 2017 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of MOTION in Limine by Woodard Villa Inc. (aty,Wilkes, Zachary) Modified docket text on 5/8/2017 (Bunting, M). See Correct Document #60 for Motion in Limine.
May 4, 2017 Filing 56 Second MOTION in Limine by Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(aty,Wilkes, Zachary)
May 4, 2017 Filing 55 First MOTION in Limine by Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Wilkes, Zachary)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles E Tabor terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/7/2017. (crt,Leday, A)
April 4, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw Charles E. Tabor as Attorney by Stephanie Woodard Erickson, Christopher Woodard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid)
March 21, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Woodard Villa Inc. (crt,Bunting, M) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2017: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Bunting, M).
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/21/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 17, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 16, 2017 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Woodard Villa Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Wilkes, Zachary)
March 16, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Deficiency to Zachary Alexander Wilkes on behalf of Woodard Villa Inc regarding #48 Reply to Response to Motion. Reason: This reply brief exceeds 10 pages. Please see LR7.8 for information regarding length of reply briefs. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 15, 2017 Filing 48 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - Judgment filed by Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit B)(aty,Wilkes, Zachary) Modified to reflect deficient status on 3/16/2017 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted in its entirety on 3/21/2017 (Bunting, M). See document #52 .
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/15/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/6/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 3, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 3, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent by Woodard Villa Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wilkes, Zachary)
February 27, 2017 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Woodard, Ernest Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1 - A9, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit D-1, #8 Exhbit E, #9 Exhibit E-1, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(aty,Jones, Reid)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #43 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted by Stephanie Woodard against Woodard Villa, Inc. in this matter be and are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/21/17. (crt,Leday, A)
February 17, 2017 Filing 43 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Stephanie Woodard Erickson and Woodard Villa Inc> by Stephanie Woodard Erickson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified filers on 2/17/2017 (Bunting, M).
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/27/2017. Replies due by 3/6/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/10/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 8, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 8, 2017 Filing 41 ISSUED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Deficiency to Reid Allen Jones on behalf of Ernest Woodard regarding #40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to reflect issued in error on 2/8/2017 (Bunting, M).
February 8, 2017 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent by Ernest Woodard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified to reflect deficient status on 2/8/2017 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficiency issued in error on 2/8/2017 (Bunting, M).
January 24, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 23, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Statement of material facts, #3 Memorandum / Brief, #4 Exhibit)(aty,Byrd, Edwin) Modified docket text on 1/24/2017 (Bunting, M).
September 26, 2016 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Woodard Villa Inc.(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
September 23, 2016 Filing 36 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Woodard Villa Inc. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/23/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 22, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent Motion to Amend Answer by Woodard Villa Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Byrd, Edwin) Modified text on 9/23/2016 (Bunting, M).
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport Court House before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2017 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2017. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/22/2016. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 12/22/2016. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 12/22/2016. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/23/2017. Discovery deadline 1/23/2017. Expert Depositions due by 2/8/2017. Daubert Motions due by 3/1/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 4/6/2017. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 4/20/2017. Motions in Limine due by 5/4/2017. Trial Depositions due by 5/30/2017. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 6/12/2017. Electronic Exhibits due by 6/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/22/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 22, 2016 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/22/2016. The scheduling order will issue separately. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 30, 2016 Filing 31 MINUTE ENTRY: setting a Telephone Status Conference for 9/22/2016 at 11:30 AM in before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Counsel for plaintiffs shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/30/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines. A scheduling conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/10/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 10, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Consolidation by Clerk. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Civil Action No. 5:15-cv-1777 is hereby consolidated with Civil Action No. 5:16-cv-1119 for all purposes. All future filings shall be filed and docketed in Civil Action No. 5:15-cv-1777. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/10/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 9, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Order with consent by Christopher Woodard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Madison, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 5:16-cv-01119 with consent by Christopher Woodard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Madison, John)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #15 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/26/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 20, 2016 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Woodard Villa Inc. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/20/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
July 20, 2016 Filing 22 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Deficiency to Zachary Alexander Wilkes on behalf of Woodard Villa Inc regarding #21 DEFICIENT ? Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Intervene with consent. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to reflect filed in error on 7/20/2016 (Bunting, M).
July 19, 2016 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Intervene with consent by Woodard Villa Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Attorney Zachary Alexander Wilkes added to party Woodard Villa Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Wilkes, Zachary) Modified to reflect motion as deficient on 7/20/2016 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 7/20/2016 (Bunting, M).
July 13, 2016 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Ernest Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1)(aty,Jones, Reid)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply and Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition. Reply Brief due by 7/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/6/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 6, 2016 Motions Transferred regarding #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition with consent MOTION for Leave to File. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 5, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition with consent by Ernest Woodard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 7/5/2016 (Bunting, M). Modified event and docket text on 7/5/2016 (Bunting, M).
June 29, 2016 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition filed by Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
June 8, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding #15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 8, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene with opposition by Ernest Woodard. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading Complaint)(Attorney John M Madison, Jr added to party Ernest Woodard(pty:mov))(aty,Madison, John)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/17/2017 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport Court House before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2016 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2016. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 6/17/2016. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 8/15/2016. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/15/2016. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/15/2016. Discovery deadline 9/15/2016. Expert Depositions due by 10/3/2016. Daubert Motions due by 10/24/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 11/8/2016. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/22/2016. Motions in Limine due by 12/6/2016. Trial Depositions due by 12/30/2016. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 1/10/2017. Electronic Exhibits due by 1/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/18/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 18, 2016 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/18/2016. A Scheduling Order will issue separately. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 11, 2016 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) Report by Christopher Woodard and Woodard Villa Inc . (aty,Madison, John) Modified filers on 5/11/2016 (Bunting, M).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/18/2016 at 12:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/4/2016. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 5/11/2016. Rule 26 Report due by 5/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/18/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 15, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Woodard Villa Inc.(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
March 31, 2016 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RULING denying #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/31/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 19, 2015 Filing 8 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Table of Contents/Table of Authorities filed by Christopher Woodard regarding #7 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, . (aty,Jones, Reid)
August 19, 2015 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Join Parties Required Under Rule 19 filed by Christopher Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Woodard Villa Statement of Assets, Liabilities and Equity)(aty,Jones, Reid)
August 17, 2015 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodard Villa Inc. (aty,Byrd, Edwin)
August 3, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding #3 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Join Parties Required Under Rule 19. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Kennedy, T)
July 31, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Join Parties Required Under Rule 19 by Woodard Villa Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Letter dated March 10, 2015, #3 Exhibit Letter dated March 16, 2015, #4 Exhibit Stock Certificates, #5 Exhibit Stock Certificate)(Attorney Edwin H Byrd, III added to party Woodard Villa Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
June 3, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Woodard Villa Inc. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 3, 2015 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 28, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woodard Villa, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2812279) filed by Christopher Woodard, Stephanie Woodard Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John M Madison, Jr added to party Stephanie Woodard Erickson(pty:selreq), Attorney John M Madison, Jr added to party Christopher Woodard(pty:selreq))(aty,Madison, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard et al v. Woodard Villa Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Woodard Erickson
Represented By: John M Madison, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Charles E Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Woodard
Represented By: John M Madison, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Charles E Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodard Villa Inc
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Wilkes
Represented By: Benjamin Turner Bethard
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ernest Woodard
Represented By: John M Madison, Jr
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Charles E Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?