Draper v. Willis Knighton Medical Center
Plaintiff: Cynthia Draper
Defendant: Willis Knighton Medical Center doing business as Oaks of Louisiana doing business as Savannah at the Oaks
Case Number: 5:2015cv01968
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 90 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/13/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/7/2017; granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion in Limine, #31 Motion in Limine, and #60 Motion in Limine. Jury Trial set for 10/10/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Compliance Deadline set for 9/15/2017 and 9/22/2017. Joint summary of medical bills due 10/2/2017. Stipulations, joint jury instructions, interrogatories and joint neutral statements due 9/29/2017. Plaintiff's final will call list due 9/29/2017. Glossary to court reporter by 9/29/2017. Electronic exhibits due 10/2/2017. Defendant's final will call list due 10/4/2017. See pdf for further deadlines. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT WITNESS LIST filed (restricted access) for Pretrial Conference by All Parties. (aty,Pugh, Lamar) Modified on 9/5/2017 to edit text and filers. (Putch, A)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JOINT PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER for Pretrial Conference by All Parties. (aty,Pugh, Lamar) Modified on 9/5/2017 to edit text and filers. (Putch, A)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JOINT EXHIBIT LIST for Pretrial Conference by All Parties. (aty,Pugh, Lamar) Modified on 9/5/2017 to edit text and filers. (Putch, A)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension. Extension is granted until 9/1/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/30/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #67 Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION of One Day to File the Joint Pretrial Order with consent. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION of One Day to File the Joint Pretrial Order with consent by Willis Knighton Medical Center. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified docket text to remove duplicate wording on 8/30/2017 (Bunting, M).
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #44 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/28/2017. (crt,Keifer, K) Modified on 8/29/2017 to correct date (Keifer, K).
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY to Response to #60 MOTION in Limine filed by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Jennifer Russell PhD, #2 Exhibits Attached to Deposition of Jennifer Russell)(crt,Putch, A)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 7/27/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion with consent sought but not yet obtained by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply, #2 Proposed pleading Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum, #3 Proposed exhibit Deposition of Jennifer Russell, Ph.D., #4 Proposed exhibit Exhibits Attached to Deposition of Jennifer Russell)(aty,Cameron, Nelson)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #63 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #60 MOTION in Limine filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 7/11/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #60 MOTION in Limine. Motion referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION in Limine by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(crt,Keifer, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2017: #2 Sealed Exhibit A - Report) (Keifer, K).
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/28/2017. The Court granted in part and denied in part #53 Motion for Leave. The motion was granted in that the Court will allow Plaintiff to file the expert's report under seal. The Court denied #55 Motion for Leave; and #56 Motion to Strike is moot. Plaintiff's counsel was given permission to conduct a deposition of Russell, scheduled for 7/13/2017. Defense counsel was given permission to depose Plaintiff's witness, Lewis, by 8/15/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone status conference is set for Wednesday, 6/28/2017, at 1:30 PM. The parties should be prepared to discuss Record documents 53, 55 and 56. Plaintiff's counsel will host the call. All trial counsel must participate. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 6/26/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #56 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Rebuttal Memorandum and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Motion in Limine re #55 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Response and Supplemental Memorandum. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Rebuttal Memorandum and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Motion in Limine re #55 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Response and Supplemental Memorandum by Willis Knighton Medical Center. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 6/22/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #55 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Response and Supplemental Memorandum to #31 Motion in Limine with opposition. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #53 MOTION for Leave to File Motion in Limine under Seal. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Response and Supplemental Memorandum to #31 Motion in Limine with opposition by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Memorandum to Supplement, #3 Proposed exhibit EEOC File, #4 Proposed pleading Rebuttal Memorandum, #5 Proposed exhibit Deposition of Carolyn Graves, #6 Proposed exhibit Deposition of Fielder)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 6/20/2017 to create link to proper pleading. (Putch, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order regarding #53 MOTION for Leave to File Motion in Limine under Seal with consent sought but not yet obtained by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 6/19/2017 to more accurately identify the pleading submitted. (Putch, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Motion in Limine under Seal by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR-Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading Motion in Limine MMPI2 and Expert, #3 Proposed Order on Motion in Limine, #4 Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine, #5 Proposed Exhibit A: Expert Report)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 6/19/2017 to edit text and to create link to proper proposed order filed as #54 Corrective Document. (Putch, A)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action to Nelson Welch Cameron on behalf of Cynthia Draper regarding #54 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order. Action taken: Modified entry to more accurately identify the pleading submitted. (crt,Putch, A)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #48 Motion to Expedite, Motion for Contempt and to Compel, without prejudice and the hearing scheduled for June 21, 2017 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/9/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED EXHIBITS A-H regarding #48 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Contempt and to Compel, MOTION for Attorney Fees. (crt,Putch, A)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Amend Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/6/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Amend/Correct #48 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Contempt and to Compel, MOTION for Attorney Fees with consent by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed exhibit)(aty,Cameron, Nelson)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #48 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Contempt and to Compel, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Putch, A)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Contempt and to Compel, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibits, #4 Proposed subpoena)(aty,Cameron, Nelson). Modified on 6/2/2017 to capture all reliefs requested in pleading; Added MOTION to Compel and for Attorney Fees. (Putch, A)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Exhaust All Administrative Remedies filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 5/19/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Exhaust All Administrative Remedies filed by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draper Declaration, #2 Exhibit EEOC File)(aty,Cameron, Nelson)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #44 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Exhaust All Administrative Remedies. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Exhaust All Administrative Remedies by Willis Knighton Medical Center. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Cynthia Draper's Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Patricia Presley Relevant Transcripts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Cynthia Draper June 8 2012 Corrective Action, #5 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Cynthia Draper Relevant Transcripts, #6 Proposed Order)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 5/2/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION in Limine filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Patricia Presley Relevant Transcripts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Patricia Presley's Sworn Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Cynthia Draper Relevant Transcripts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Mary Ann Wade Relevant Transcripts)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 5/2/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION in Limine filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Carolyn Graves Relevant Transcripts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Cynthia Draper Relevant Transcipts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Response to the Plaintiff's Request for Production, #4 Exhibit 4 - Relevant Pages from Carolyn Graves' Employment File, #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Geoffrey Cazes Relevant Transcripts, #6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Patricia Presley Relevant Transcripts, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Cynthia Draper Errata Sheet)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 5/2/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/27/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 10/10/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 8/3/2017. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 8/17/2017. Trial Depositions due by 9/11/2017. Electronic Exhibits, if any, (call for specific instructions on electronic exhibits), due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/6/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2017; The Court granted in part, denied in part and deferred in part #31 Motion in Limine. Jury Trial reset for 10/10/2017 09:00 AM in Shreveport Court House before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. The Pretrial Conference is reset for 9/7/2017 01:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. The parties are to have depositions and evaluations scheduled by 5/1/2017, and completed by 6/30/2017. The Court gave plaintiff's counsel permission to reschedule the deposition of Gardasha Lewis. The Court gave the parties permission to file additional briefs and/or motions until 5/1/2017. Amended scheduling order to follow. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION in Limine filed by Cynthia Draper. (aty,Cameron, Nelson)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT: SEALED DOCUMENT - WKMC Medical Record of Cynthia Draper by Willis Knighton Medical Center re #36 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,. (aty,Pugh, Robert)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 MOTION in Limine filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Deposition of Cynthia Draper Relevant Transcripts, #2 Exhibit 2 Defendant's Response to the Plaintiff's Request for Production, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiff's EEOC Claim Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #4 4 Exhibit Affidavit of Geoffrey Cazes, #5 5 Exhibit Janice Latvala Notes Detailing the Events Surrounding the Plaintiff's Termination, #6 6 Exhibit FMLA Leave Requests for Cynthia Draper, #7 7 Exhibit Cynthia Draper Unemployment Benefits Documentation, #8 8 Exhibit Relevant Employee and Supervisory Handbooks, #9 9 Exhibit Relevant Pages from the Plaintiff's Request for Production, #10 10 Exhibit Tiffany Simmons' Employment File, #11 11 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #12 12 Exhibit Deposition of Carter Boyd, M.D. Relevant Transcripts, #13 13 Exhibit Letter from Carter Boyd, M.D. to the Defendant, #14 14 Exhibit STAT/Companion Home Health Employment Records for Cynthia Draper, #15 16 Exhibit Cynthia Draper Employment Records from the Gables at Spring Lake)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 4/4/2017 to create link to Sealed Exhibit 15 filed as #37 Sealed Document. (Putch, A)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court hereby sets a telephone status Conference for 4/5/2017 at 3:30 PM. Plaintiff's counsel will host the call. All trial counsel must participate. The use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/31/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #31 MOTION in Limine, #30 MOTION in Limine. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Motion in Limine filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center regarding #31 MOTION in Limine . (aty,Pugh, Lamar)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT: Exhibit 7 to Defendant's Motion in Limine Filed Under Seal by Willis Knighton Medical Center re #31 MOTION in Limine . (aty,Pugh, Lamar)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION in Limine (pdf of Main Document - Memorandum in Support) by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiff Response to Interrgatoires, #2 Exhibit 2 Defendant's Interrogatories Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiff Response to Request for Production, #4 Exhibit 4 Defendant's Request for Production Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 5 Cynthia Draper Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit 7 Cover Page Exhibit to be filed separately under seal, #8 Exhibit 8 Carolyn Graves Deposition Excertps, #9 Exhibit 9 Patricia Pressley Deposition Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 10 Cynthia Draper Deposition Errata Sheet, #11 Exhibit 11 Cynthia Draper Sworn Declaration, #12 Proposed order)(aty,Pugh, Lamar) Modified on 3/28/2017 to reflect Sealed Exhibit 7 filed as #32 Sealed Document and pdf of motion filed as #33 Corrective Document. (Putch, A)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION in Limine by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Cameron, Nelson)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OBJECTIONS AND SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Putch, A)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Objections and Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/1/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #27 MOTION for Leave to File Rule 56(c) Objections and Supplemental Memorandum with opposition . Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Rule 56(c) Objections and Supplemental Memorandum with opposition re #18 Motion for Summary Judgment by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Memorandum, #2 Proposed exhibit Deposition Excerpt of Allen Draper, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 2/28/2017 to create link to proper pleading. (Putch, A)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deposition of Cynthia Draper Relevant Transcripts, #2 Exhibit B Deposition of Janice Latvala Relevant Transcripts, #3 Exhibit C Deposition of Beatrice Balthazar Relevant Transcripts, #4 Exhibit D Deposition of Gail Holder Relevant Transcripts, #5 Exhibit E Deposition of Geoffrey Cazes Relevant Transcripts, #6 Exhibit F Willis-Knightons Response to Plaintiffs Request for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit G Deposition of Carolyn Graves Relevant Transcripts, #8 Exhibit H Deposition of Jerry A. Fielder, II Relevant Transcripts, #9 Exhibit I Deposition of Patricia Presley Relevant Transcripts, #10 Exhibit J Deposition of Mary Ann Wade Relevant Transcripts)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Statement of material facts, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 46, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Plaintiff's Declaration, #6 Plaintiff's Deposition, #7 Belthazar Deposition, #8 Graves Deposition, #9 Cazes Deposition, #10 Holder Deposition, #11 Fielder Deposition, #12 Latvala Deposition, #13 Wade Deposition, #14 Presley Deposition, #15 Fisher v. Lufkin Industries)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 2/14/2017 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding #22 Motion for Contempt and to Compel Attendance at Deposition; Plaintiff's motion is denied. However, Plaintiff is granted leave to refile the motion and set forth more clearly (if it is, in fact, the case) that the $40 witness fee and reasonably estimated mileage fee were tendered to the deponent at the time of service. Otherwise, Plaintiff must reissue the subpoena with the appropriate fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/27/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Opposition due by 2/14/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 1/26/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent . Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Sanctions/Contempt and MOTION to Compel Attendance at Deposition, MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Gardasha Lewis by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibits, #4 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1)(aty,Cameron, Nelson). Modified on 1/25/2017 to capture all reliefs requested in pleading; Added MOTION for Sanctions and Added MOTION for Order to Show Cause. (Putch, A)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment with consent by Cynthia Draper. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibits A-C)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 1/25/2017 to edit text. (Putch, A)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Exhibit 4 filed by Willis Knighton Medical Center regarding #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (aty,Pugh, Lamar)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Statement of material facts, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit 1-Cynthia Draper Petition, #4 Exhibit 2-WKMC Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit 3-Cynthia Draper Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5-Patricia Presley Deposition Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6-Mary Ann Wade Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7-Cynthia Draper Corrective Actions, #9 Exhibit 8-Geoffrey Casez Deposition Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9-Gail Holder Deposition Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 10-Beatrice Balthazar Deposition Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 11-WKMC EEOC Policy, #13 Exhibit 12-Employee Handbook Receipt, #14 13-Exhibit Cynthia Draper Orientation, #15 Exhibit 14-Jerry A. Fielder, II Deposition Excerpts, #16 Exhibit 15-Affidavit and Notes from Geoffrey Casez, #17 Proposed order)(aty,Pugh, Robert) Modified on 1/9/2017 to edit text and to create link to Exhibit 4 filed as #19 Corrective Document. (Putch, A)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/5/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2017. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 10/30/2016. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 11/30/2016. Discovery deadline 11/30/2016. Expert Depositions due by 12/22/2016. Daubert Motions due by 1/6/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 3/10/2017. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 3/24/2017. Motions in Limine due by 3/27/2017. Trial Depositions due by 5/12/2017. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 5/26/2017. Electronic Exhibits due by 5/26/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/3/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: A telephone status conference was held on 9/30/2016; mooting #14 Joint Motion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY: (District Judge Telephone Status Conference set for 9/30/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth E Foote.) Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 09/23/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Pre-Trial Deadlines with consent by All Parties. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) Modified on 9/20/2016 to edit filers. (Putch, A)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Motions Transferred regarding #14 JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Pre-Trial Deadlines. Motions referred to Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/6/2017 9:00 AM in Shreveport Court House before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2017 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2017. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 2/6/2016. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 4/15/2016. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/31/2016. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/30/2016. Discovery deadline 9/30/2016. Compel discovery 9/30/2016. Expert Depositions due by 10/31/2016. Daubert Motions due by 11/21/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 12/29/2016. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/12/2017. Motions in Limine due by 1/26/2017. Trial Depositions due by 2/21/2017. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 2/27/2017. Electronic Exhibits due by 2/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/6/16. (crt,Delgado, S)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2016. The parties requested an extendeddiscovery schedule due to the large number of potential witnesses. (crt,Delgado, S)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by All Parties. (aty,Pugh, Lamar) Modified on 12/30/2015 to edit filers. (Putch, A)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Robert G Pugh, III for Willis Knighton Medical Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/4/2015. (crt,Putch, A)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2016 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 12/16/2015. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/30/2015. Rule 26 Report due by 12/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/4/15. (crt,Delgado, S)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Robert G. Pugh, III to Enroll as Counsel by Willis Knighton Medical Center. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pugh, Lamar)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(aty,Pugh, Lamar)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Willis Knighton Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Lamar P Pugh added to party Willis Knighton Medical Center(pty:dft))(aty,Pugh, Lamar) Modified on 9/4/2015 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cynthia Draper. Willis Knighton Medical Center waiver sent on 7/7/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (aty,Cameron, Nelson)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Willis Knighton Medical Center (crt,Putch, A)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/1/2015. (crt,Putch, A)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Cameron, Nelson) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/29/2015) (Whidden, C).
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Willis Knighton Medical Center d/b/a The Oaks of Louisiana with Jury Demand (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Cynthia Draper. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Nelson Welch Cameron added to party Cynthia Draper(pty:pet))(aty,Cameron, Nelson) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/29/2015) (Whidden, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. Willis Knighton Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Draper
Represented By: Nelson Welch Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis Knighton Medical Center doing business as Oaks of Louisiana doing business as Savannah at the Oaks
Represented By: Lamar P Pugh
Represented By: Robert G Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?