Swenson v. Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture et al

Plaintiff: Katheryn Swenson
Defendant: Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture, United of Omaha Life Insurance Co and Lincoln National Life Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2015cv02042
Filed: July 14, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 61 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture, 62 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Co, 69 MOTION to Strike Affidavits, and 76 MOTION to Conduct Discovery filed by Katheryn Swenson. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/7/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
October 19, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim for denial of benefits and her claims for violation of COBRA against Lincoln National Life Insurance Co are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust, and her claims f or equitable relief and breach of fiduciary duty against Lincoln National are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. United of Omaha Life Insurance Co's Motion to Dismiss 45 and Eldorado's Motion to Dismiss 51 are DENIED with the right to reurge the ir motions within 60 days of the date of this order. If no new motions to dismiss are filed within 60 days of the date of this order, the Clerk of Court is directed to remand this case, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, to the First Judicial District, Caddo Parish, where it was pending as suit number 585387-B. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/19/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 Report and Recommendations, denying 12 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/16/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swenson v. Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katheryn Swenson
Represented By: Wade Thomas Visconte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Represented By: Brian Christopher Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas E Loehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Blake Bryant Goodsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?