Mayfield v. DeSoto Parish et al

Plaintiff: Mary R Mayfield
Defendant: Police Jury DeSoto Parish, Reggie C Roe, Gary Vincent Evans and Steve Brown
Case Number: 5:2015cv02374
Filed: September 16, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to turn over all recordings and transcripts immediately to Defendants. Within seven days of this order, Plaintiff is ordered to provide a complete list of all healthcare providers that she saw during that perio d of time up to present. Plaintiff is also ordered to provide signed HIPAA releases so that Defendants may obtain Plaintiffs records from each of those treaters. Defendants are ordered to provide copies of all medical records they receive, as they are received, to counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/12/2017. (crt,Keller, J)
May 25, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 28 MOTION for Reconsideration re 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 5/24/2017. (crt,Keller, J)
February 6, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's civil conspiracy claim and 1981 retaliation claim against Evans are dismissed without prejudice; plaintiff's claims against Evans under Title VII for hostile work environment, retaliation and constructive discharge are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/5/17. (crt,Keller, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfield v. DeSoto Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary R Mayfield
Represented By: Fred H Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Jury DeSoto Parish
Represented By: Jennifer P McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie C Roe
Represented By: Jennifer P McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Vincent Evans
Represented By: Bryce J Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Brown
Represented By: Jennifer P McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?