Hassan v. Shreveport et al

Plaintiff: M'Leah Hassan
Defendant: City of Shreveport, Willie L Shaw, Jr and James Greene
Case Number: 5:2015cv02820
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2018 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion in Limine. IT IS ORDERED that Hassan provide the Court the transcripts requested in this order by 7/2/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an evidentiary hearing on the question of the existence of a conspiracy between Gipson and Defendants at the time of the telephone calls recorded as Plaintiff's Exhibits 30 and 31 will be scheduled at a later time. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 6/18/2018. Copy provided to E Johnson. (crt,Keifer, K)
November 30, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. The Court DENIES Hassan's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the City and Shaw's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS summary judgment for th e City and for Shaw in his official capacity on Hassan's claim for punitive damages. The Court DENIES summary judgment on all remaining claims against the City and against Shaw in his official capacity and on all claims against Shaw in hi s individual capacity. All state and federal claims against Greene remain pending. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/30/2017.IT IS ORDERED that the punitive damages claims against the City and against Shaw in his official capacity are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(crt,Crick, S)
February 1, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: adopting 25 Report and Recommendation; granting 18 Motion for Sanctions as to non-party witness. (Court Reporter: Barbara Simpson) (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. Shreveport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M'Leah Hassan
Represented By: Sarah Russell Giglio
Represented By: Elton B Richey, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Vergis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie L Shaw, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greene
Represented By: Donald E Hathaway, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?