Weyerhaeuser Co v. Pardee Minerals L L C et al
Plaintiff: Weyerhaeuser Co
Defendant: Pardee Minerals L L C, E P Energy E & P Co L P, Wildhorse Resources II L L C, Michael M Carnes, Suzanne Carnes, Carnes Oil Corp, Carnes Texas Ltd, Richard P DeCamara and James S Thigpen
Case Number: 5:2017cv00856
Filed: July 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bienville
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JUDGMENT Adopting 91 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Granting 69 Motion to Dismiss filed by E P Energy E & P Co L P. All claims against E P Energy E & P Co L P are Dismissed With Prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/30/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM RULING re 81 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) or in the Alternative, MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by E P Energy E & P Co L P. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/10/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM RULING re 64 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by James S Thigpen, Suzanne Carnes, Pardee Minerals L L C, Richard P DeCamara, Carnes Texas Ltd, Michael M Carnes, Carnes Oil Corp. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/28/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM RULING re 59 MOTION to Realign Parties for Purposes of Discovery and Trial filed by Weyerhaeuser Co. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/21/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT adopting 51 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Granting 42 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims for Lack of Jurisdiction. Cross-claims asserted against EP Energy E & P Company L P are Dismissed Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/17/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weyerhaeuser Co v. Pardee Minerals L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weyerhaeuser Co
Represented By: Shelton D Blunt
Represented By: Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pardee Minerals L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E P Energy E & P Co L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildhorse Resources II L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnes Oil Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnes Texas Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P DeCamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?