Phillips et al v. Whittington et al
Plaintiff: |
Todd Phillips, Jodi Phillips, Brooke Phillips and Abby Phillips |
Defendant: |
Julian C Whittington, Bruce Bletz, Hugo A Holland, Jr, J Schuyler Marvin and Jane & John Does |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv01524 |
Filed: |
November 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Shreveport Office |
County: |
Bossier |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark L Hornsby |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert G James |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2022 |
Filing
230
MEMORANDUM RULING denying 215 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. After a careful review of the factual record, and considering Mr. Bokenfohr's limited involvement in the case, Ms. Buckle's extensive involvement in the case, and the satisfac tory evidence that Bokenfohr has been screened from this case since he joined the Buckle firm, the court finds that disqualification of Plaintiffs' attorney is not appropriate. Mr. Wilson has not demonstrated any reason to believe that his confi dential information was improperly shared by his former counsel or that it might be in the future. When that lack of a showing is weighed against the extreme hardship disqualification would place on Plaintiffs, the result is that the motion to disqualify should be denied. Accordingly, Gary Wilson's Motion to Disqualify (Doc. 215) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/31/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
|
October 28, 2020 |
Filing
182
MEMORANDUM RULING re 139 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by J Schuyler Marvin, Hugo A Holland, Jr and 141 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by J Schuyler Marvin, Hugo A Holland, Jr. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/28/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
|
December 2, 2019 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM ORDER. The BSO defendants are ordered to supplement their production in accordance with this order no later than December 10, 2019. The court will shred the copy submitted for the in camera review. See Memorandum Order for details. Compliance Deadline set for 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/2/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
49
JUDGMENT Adopting 47 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Granting 39 Motion to Dismiss as to the claims against Holland under Claim II (Failure to Intervene), Claim III (Due Process and Excessive Pre-Accusation Delay, and Claims V and VI (Policy and Custom), and these claims are Dismissed With Prejudice. The motion is Denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/31/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?