Ferguson v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona et al
Plaintiff: Tony Ferguson
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co of Arizona L L C and Demoreo Lenoir
Intervenor_plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Co
Intervenor_defendant: Tony Ferguson, Demoreo Lenoir and Swift Transportation Co of Arizona L L C
Case Number: 5:2017cv01570
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Webster
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM ORDER. In light of the recent continuance, the court finds that the best exercise of its discretion is to allow Plaintiff to retain Dr. Jennings to issue a rebuttal expert report. Dr. Jennings' report is limited to rebutting or critic izing the methodology and conclusions in Dr. Staats' report. Dr. Jennings may not do any additional testing or provide any new information in her rebuttal report. Dr. Jennings' rebuttal report shall be tendered to Defendants no later than < b>January 29, 2021. Defendants, if they wish, may depose Dr. Jennings on a date and time convenient to her and to all counsel but not later than February 19, 2021. The parties are encouraged to take the deposition by Zoom. Plaintiff's deadline to file a Daubert motion regarding Dr. Staats is extended to January 22, 2021. Defendants' deadline to file any Daubert motion related to Dr. Jennings is March 12, 2021. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/7/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 94 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision, affirming 90 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/22/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Motion for Protective Order 80 which is granted in part and denied in part as set forth below. Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel 82 is pending but is not yet fully briefed. Counsel shall confer in good faith by telephon e and determine which issues in the Plaintiff's motion were not resolved by the above ruling. The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs to discuss any issues that remain despite the court's ruling. The briefs shall not to exceed seven pages and leave of court is hereby granted in advance for their filing. The parties shall not use the supplemental briefs to reargue issues that were decided above. The supplemental briefs are due by July 8, 2020. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/30/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 7 Amended Notice of Removal filed by Demoreo Lenoir, Swift Transportation Co of Arizona L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/19/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Swift will be allowed until January 8, 2018 to file an amended 1 Notice of Removal and clarify its ownership. It may also include additional allegations with respect to the amount in controversy. The court will then determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction or must remand the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/6/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ferguson
Represented By: Jack M Bailey, III
Represented By: Jack M Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Mary Lou Salley Bylsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co of Arizona L L C
Represented By: Thomas Henry James Cook
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demoreo Lenoir
Represented By: Thomas Henry James Cook
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Co
Represented By: James T Busenlener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Tony Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Demoreo Lenoir
Represented By: Thomas Henry James Cook
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Swift Transportation Co of Arizona L L C
Represented By: Thomas Henry James Cook
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?