State Farm Fire & Casualty Co v. Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Defendant: X Y Z Seller, A B C Insurance Co, A B C Component Parts Manufacturer, Felix Storch, Inc., Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Great American Insurance Company, D E F Manufacturer, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Felix Storch Inc, Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Sunit Hong Kong Ltd, Yantai Taihai Manoir Nuclear Power Co Ltd, Sichuan Danfu Compressor Co Ltd, Ping An Property & Casualty Insurance Co of China, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc and Ace American Insurance Co
Intervenor Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Co
Intervenor Defendant: A C E American Ins Co
Case Number: 5:2017cv01654
Filed: December 21, 2017
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
0 Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
1 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Sunit Hong Kong Ltd served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (crt,YocumSld, M)
November 8, 2018 45 NOTICE of International Service of Process in Hong Kong by FedEx re #30 Summons Issued from Legal Language Services. Documents sent by Clerk to Japan via FedEx on 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Service Documents, #3 Envelope)(crt,Crick, S)
October 25, 2018 44 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm by Matthew S McLean on behalf of Great American Insurance Co (aty,McLean, Matthew) Modified on 10/25/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 17, 2018 43 ANSWER to #36 Intervenor Complaint by A C E American Ins Co.(Attorney Thomas Charles Lundin, Jr added to party A C E American Ins Co(pty:intvd))(aty,Lundin, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 42 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by Ace American Insurance Co.(aty,Lundin, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 41 ANSWER to #36 Intervenor Complaint by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(aty,Lundin, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 40 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(aty,Lundin, Thomas)
October 16, 2018 39 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/16/2018. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report to the court no later than April 16, 2019, and then every 90 days after that. A paper courtesy copy should be delivered to chambers promptly after filing. Any party may request a status conference at any time simply by contacting the undersigned. Compliance Deadline set for 4/16/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
October 3, 2018 38 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Felix Storch Inc.(aty,Roberts, Milton)
October 3, 2018 37 ANSWER to #36 Intervenor Complaint with Jury Demand by Felix Storch Inc.(aty,Roberts, Milton)
October 1, 2018 36 FIRST AMENDED INTERVENOR COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Great American Insurance Co.(crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 10/2/2018 to indicate jury trial demand (FinnSld, P).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Amend Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/1/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 28, 2018 34 First MOTION to Amend Intervention with consent by Great American Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Herrin, Grant) Modified on 10/1/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 24, 2018 33 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Entry of Appearance by Matthew S McLean on behalf of Great American Insurance Co (aty,McLean, Matthew) Modified to edit docket text on 9/24/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/5/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 4, 2018 31 MOTION for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Preuett-Armour, Bonita)
August 21, 2018 30 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ping An Property & Casualty Insurance Co of China, Sichuan Danfu Compressor Co Ltd, Sunit Hong Kong Ltd, Yantai Taihai Manoir Nuclear Power Co Ltd (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 21, 2018 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A B C Component Parts Manufacturer, A B C Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Co, Felix Storch Inc, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc, X Y Z Seller, Sunit Hong Kong Ltd, Ping An Property & Casualty Insurance Co of China, Sichuan Danfu Compressor Co Ltd, Yantai Taihai Manoir Nuclear Power Co Ltd filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(crt,FinnSld, P)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/21/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 20, 2018 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Preuett-Armour, Bonita)
August 20, 2018 26 NOTICE of Deficiency to Bonita K Preuett-Armour on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Co regarding #25 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental & Amending Complaint. Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form. (crt,FinnSld, P)
August 17, 2018 25 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental & Amending Complaint with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Preuett-Armour, Bonita) Modified on 8/17/2018 to reflect pleading as deficient (Putch, A). Modified on 8/20/2018 to indicate refiled in its entirety as Document #27 (FinnSld, P).
May 2, 2018 24 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/2/2018. The deadline for amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties is October 1, 2018. A follow-up telephone status conference is set for October 16, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff will initiate the conference call. The use of cell phones is prohibited. (crt,Keller, J)
May 1, 2018 23 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The time of the telephone scheduling conference set for 5/2/2018 is 11:00 a.m. There was a typographical error in the Minute Entry dated 4/30/2018 (Doc. 22). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 5/1/2018. (crt,Guin, P.)
April 30, 2018 22 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2018 at 10:30 a.m. will now be conducted by TELEPHONE. The court will initiate the conference call, and dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. The use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 4/30/2018. (crt,Guin, P.)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The parties have now filed a Case Management Report #20 They state in response to the prior order that Ace American Insurance Company is the proper Ace party. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate as a defendant Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/26/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
April 25, 2018 20 RULE 26(f) Report by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc, A C E American Ins Co, Great American Insurance Co, Felix Storch Inc. (aty,Preuett-Armour, Bonita) Modified on 4/26/2018 to add parties (FinnSld, P).
April 25, 2018 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group Inc for Great American Insurance Co. (aty,Herrin, Grant)
April 25, 2018 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd for Ace American Insurance Co. (aty,Lundin, Thomas)
April 25, 2018 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc (Attorney Thomas Charles Lundin, Jr added to party Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc(pty:intvd)). (aty,Lundin, Thomas)
April 17, 2018 16 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, with Jury Demand by Felix Storch Inc.(aty,Roberts, Milton)
April 17, 2018 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Felix Storch Inc.(aty,Roberts, Milton)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 4/11/2018. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 4/25/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 4/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/19/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The court will soon set a scheduling conference and require the filing of a Case Management Report. The parties are directed to state in that report which of the Ace entities is the proper defendant in this case. The court will then terminate as a defendant any Ace defendant that does not belong in this suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/15/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
February 14, 2018 12 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Affidavit of Service for Citation and Petition of Intervention served on Felix Storch, Inc. on 12/19/2017 filed by Great American Insurance Co regarding #11 Affidavit of Service . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery)(aty,Herrin, Grant) Modified on 2/14/2018 to indicate Answer set for 3/7/2018 (FinnSld, P).
February 14, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Citation and Petition of Intervention served on Felix Storch, Inc. on 12/19/2017, filed by Great American Insurance Co. (aty,Herrin, Grant)
January 12, 2018 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Preuett-Armour, Bonita)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Matthew S McLean for Great American Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/11/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Extension. The corporate disclosure statement has now been filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/8/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
January 8, 2018 7 MOTION for Matthew S. McLean to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3554712) by Great American Insurance Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing Illinois, #3 Certificate of good standing Indiana)(aty,Herrin, Grant) Modified on 1/9/2018 to replace pdf of Main Document 7 & Attachment 1 with non-fillable form (Putch, A).
January 8, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Felix Storch Inc identifying Other Affiliate Felix Storch Inc for Felix Storch Inc. (aty,Roberts, Milton)
January 5, 2018 5 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement with consent by Felix Storch Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aty,Roberts, Milton) Modified on 1/8/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 4 REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/27/2017. (crt,Keller, J)
December 22, 2017 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 22, 2017 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Milton Caldwell Roberts, Jr on behalf of Felix Storch Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/5/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 21, 2017 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 21, 2017 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Great American Insurance Company.(Attorney Grant Thomas Herrin added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:dft))(crt,Thigpen, M) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
December 21, 2017 ANSWER to Complaint by Ace American Insurance Co.(Attorney Thomas C Lundin added to party Ace American Insurance Co(pty:dft))(crt,Thigpen, M) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
December 21, 2017 ANSWER to Complaint by Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc. (Attorney Thomas C Lundin added to party Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.(pty:dft))(crt,Thigpen, M). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
December 21, 2017 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 153961-F with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3545096) filed by Felix Storch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney Milton Caldwell Roberts, Jr added to party Felix Storch, Inc.(pty:selreq))(aty,Roberts, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co v. Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Seller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Component Parts Manufacturer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Storch, Inc.
Represented By: Milton Caldwell Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D E F Manufacturer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Storch Inc
Represented By: Milton Caldwell Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunit Hong Kong Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yantai Taihai Manoir Nuclear Power Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sichuan Danfu Compressor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ping An Property & Casualty Insurance Co of China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc
Represented By: Thomas Charles Lundin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas Charles Lundin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Bonita K Preuett-Armour
Represented By: Tinashe Eugene Chimwaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Great American Insurance Co
Represented By: Matthew S McLean
Represented By: Grant Thomas Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: A C E American Ins Co
Represented By: Thomas Charles Lundin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?