Allen v. Royal Trucking Co et al
Plaintiff: Cory Allen
Defendant: Royal Trucking Co, Emmett Battle and Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Cross_claimant: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Cross_defendant: Emmett Battle and Royal Trucking Co
Case Number: 5:2018cv00420
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM RULING re 179 MOTION to Strike Declaration Attached as Exhibit B to 167 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Kansas City Southern, Kansas City Southern Railway Co, 168 MOTION to Strike References in 142 MOTION for Sum mary Judgment filed by Royal Trucking Co, 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kansas City Southern, Kansas City Southern Railway Co. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 11/2/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM RULING re 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Royal Trucking Co. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 10/8/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 152 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision and affirming 151 Memorandum Order. Further Ordered that 159 Motion for Oral Argument is denied. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/23/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 39 Daubert Motion. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/31/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Royal Trucking Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Allen
Represented By: Bristol Alan Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Trucking Co
Represented By: John F Frederickson
Represented By: Mark A Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmett Battle
Represented By: John F Frederickson
Represented By: Mark A Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Pressly, IV
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Pressly, IV
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Emmett Battle
Represented By: John F Frederickson
Represented By: Mark A Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Royal Trucking Co
Represented By: John F Frederickson
Represented By: Mark A Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?