Smith et al v. T R W Automotive U S L L C et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Wayne Smith and Kimberly Smith
Defendant: Chrysler LLC, TRW Automotive US LLC, FCA US LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., Chrysler L L C, T R W Automotive U S L L C, T R W Vehicle Safety Systems Inc and F C A U S L L C
Case Number: 5:2018cv00995
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F C A U S L L C identifying Corporate Parent F C A North America Holdings L L C, Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N V for F C A U S L L C . (aty,Bryant, Camille) Modified to edit docket text on 8/15/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 8/2/2018. (crt,Guin, P.)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Camille R Bryant, Marshall Thomas Cox, Gary G Hebert on behalf of FCA US LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/15/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 1, 2018 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC.(aty,Hebert, Gary)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 156745 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3716677) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Gary G Hebert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Hebert, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. T R W Automotive U S L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Wayne Smith
Represented By: Jessica Welch Williams
Represented By: Donecia Banks-Miley
Represented By: Kristen Brown Pleasant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Smith
Represented By: Jessica Welch Williams
Represented By: Donecia Banks-Miley
Represented By: Kristen Brown Pleasant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Gary G Hebert
Represented By: Marshall Thomas Cox
Represented By: Camille R Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T R W Automotive U S L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T R W Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C A U S L L C
Represented By: Gary G Hebert
Represented By: Marshall Thomas Cox
Represented By: Camille R Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?