Dooley v. MB Industries, LLC et al
Appellee: MBI Global, LLC, BKLC, LLC, Carmel Enterprises L L C, MBI Construction and Logistics Services, LLC, Gert Lessing, MB Industries, LLC, Hallwood Financial Ltd, Anthony Gumbiner, Hallwood Modular Buildings L L C, X-Treme Doors L L C, Carmel Foods L L C, Frederick J Gossen, The Carmel Group, Inc., M B I Construction & Logistics Services L L C, B K L C L L C, M B I Global L L C, Carmel Group Inc and M B Industries L L C
Appellant: David M Dooley, Sr
Case Number: 5:2018cv01039
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Set Deadline per #7 Order: Appellant Brief due by 11/12/2018. (crt,Putch, A)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding Bankruptcy Appeal; extending brief to be filed on or before 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/24/2018. (crt,Keifer, K) Modified on 9/27/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
September 21, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal with consent by David M Dooley, Sr. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) Modified on 9/21/2018 to more accurately identify the pleading submitted (Putch, A).
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Putch, A)
September 13, 2018 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. (crt,Gray, J)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by M B Industries L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 546, 577 from 14BK-12416, #2 BK Doc POC 42 from 14BK-12416, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Gray, J)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by David M Dooley, Sr (Attachments: #1 BK DOCS 1, 2, 10 (15AP-1005), #2 BK DOC 11 Main Document (15AP-1005), #3 BK DOC 11 Exhibit A (15AP-1005), #4 BK DOC 11 Exhibit (15AP-1005), #5 BK DOC 15(15AP-1005), #6 BK DOC 58(15AP-1005), #7 BK DOCS 100, 176, 204, 249, 250, 275, 276, 283, 315, 323 (15AP-1005), #8 BK DOCS 375, 376, 377, 381 (15AP-1005), #9 BK DOC 383 (15AP-1005), #10 BK DOCS 387, 388, 389, 391, 393, 394 (15AP-1005), #11 BK Docket sheet (15AP-1005), #12 BK DOCS 237, 238, 254 (14BK-12416), #13 BK DOCS 302, 487, 488, 532 (14BK-12416), #14 BK DOCS 539, 540, 542 (14BK-12416), #15 BK DOCS 572, 579 (14BK-12416), #16 BK Docket sheet (14BK-12416))(crt,Jones, R) Modified on 9/7/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Michael Moyers on behalf of M B Industries L L C (Attorney Seth Michael Moyers added to party M B Industries L L C(pty:e)) (aty,Moyers, Seth)
August 9, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 8/1/2018 signed by Bankruptcy Judge Jeffrey P Norman filed by David M Dooley, Sr. (Attachments: #1 AP Memorandum-Opinion Appealed, #2 AP Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 AP Docket Sheet)(Attorney Gerald C Delaunay added to party David M Dooley, Sr(pty:a))(crt,Rodgers, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley v. MB Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MBI Global, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Frank J Wright
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BKLC, LLC
Represented By: Frank J Wright
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carmel Enterprises L L C
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MBI Construction and Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Frank J Wright
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gert Lessing
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MB Industries, LLC
Represented By: John S Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hallwood Financial Ltd
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Anthony Gumbiner
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hallwood Modular Buildings L L C
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: X-Treme Doors L L C
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carmel Foods L L C
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Frederick J Gossen
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Carmel Group, Inc.
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: M B I Construction & Logistics Services L L C
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Represented By: Frank J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: B K L C L L C
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Represented By: Frank J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: M B I Global L L C
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Frank J Wright
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carmel Group Inc
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Robert W Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: M B Industries L L C
Represented By: John S Hodge
Represented By: Seth Michael Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David M Dooley, Sr
Represented By: Gerald C Delaunay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?