Peterson et al v. Applebees Restaurants L L C
Plaintiff: Mell Peterson and Clarence Peterson
Defendant: Cintas Corp #2, Apple Arkansas Inc and Applebees Restaurant L L C
Case Number: 5:2018cv01215
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/20/2018. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 11/26/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/24/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Apple Arkansas Inc.(Attorney John Gerard Yadamec added to party Apple Arkansas Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Yadamec, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, Answer to Original and First Amended Petitions for Damages and Reiterations of Request for Trial by Jury by Cintas Corp #2.(aty,Turnage, John) Modified to edit docket text on 10/12/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The amended notice of removal (Doc. 7) and other filings present facts that suggest a factual basis for the exercise of diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. This assessment is preliminary and subject to reassessment sua sponte or if a motion is filed that challenges jurisdiction. The two defendants are Cintas Corporation No. 2 and Apple Arkansas, Inc. Plaintiffs are reminded of their obligation to make timely service, within 90 days of the removal, after which the claims against an unserved defendant may be dismissed. Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 4(m). The court will set a scheduling conference after both defendants have filed answers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/1/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cintas Corp #2. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, As allowed by Memorandum Order. (aty,Turnage, John) Modified to more accurately reflect document filed on 9/28/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Cintas will be allowed until October 1, 2018 to file an amended notice of removal and allege with specificity the state in which Apple Arkansas, Inc., has its principal place of business. Assuming jurisdiction is established by the amended notice, the court will set a scheduling conference once the two defendants have filed an answer. Compliance Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/20/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/19/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 17, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 17, 2018 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Arkansas Inc, Cintas Corp #2 filed by Clarence Peterson, Mell Peterson. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cintas Corporation No. 2 identifying Corporate Parent Cintas Corporation No. 2 for Cintas Corporation No. 2. (aty,Turnage, John)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Cintas Corporation No. 2 . (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Compliance With Removal Order)(aty,Turnage, John)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 156,354 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3754744) filed by Cintas Corporation No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Petition, #4 Exhibit Motion and Order to Substitute, #5 Exhibit Answer to Petition, #6 Exhibit Treatment Summary, #7 Exhibit Medical, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal)(Attorney John C Turnage added to party Cintas Corporation No. 2(pty:selreq))(aty,Turnage, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson et al v. Applebees Restaurants L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corp #2
Represented By: John C Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Christian B Bogart
Represented By: John Gerard Yadamec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applebees Restaurant L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mell Peterson
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Peterson
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?