Morris & Dickson Co L L C v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: Morris & Dickson Co L L C
Defendant: U S Drug Enforcement Administration, United States of America, United States Department of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, Uttam Dhillon, U S Dept of Justice, USA and Matthew G Whitaker
Undetermined: Uttam Dhillon, in his offical capacity as acting administrator of the DEA
Case Number: 5:2018cv01406
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE by Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, USA, Matthew G Whitaker re #38 Status Report . (aty,Patil, Chetan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT Regarding December 13, 2018 Conference Among Counsel for the Parties by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (aty,Jones, Reid)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that Acting Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker issubstituted as Defendant for former Attorney General Jefferson B. Sessions, III pursuant to Rule 25( d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Matthew G Whitaker added. Jefferson B Sessions, III terminated.Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 12/3/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 28, 2018 Filing 36 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA. (aty,Patil, Chetan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (aty,Jones, Reid)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jeffrey R Johnson for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/20/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 19, 2018 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per #27 MINUTES, filed by Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA. (aty,Patil, Chetan) Modified on 11/20/2018 to add document relation (FinnSld, P).
November 19, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support of this Court's Jurisdiction to Adjudicate this Case by Morris & Dickson Co L L C re #27 MINUTES, Status Conference. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 11/20/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
November 19, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Jeffrey R. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3810009) by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid)
November 15, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by Morris & Dickson Co L L C of Filing of Notice to Respondent and Government in DEA Administrative Action (aty,Jones, Reid)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS ORDERED that an evidentiary hearing is set for 3/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Once it has resolved issues of jurisdiction and justiciability, the Court will determine the necessity and scope of this hearing. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/13/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS ORDERED that the parties are to update the Court by 11/28/2018 at 5:00 p.m. regarding the ALJ's response to this Court's proposed timeline for a ruling on justiciability and jurisdiction by January 15, 2019 and on the merits of the constitutional questions (if necessary) by the end of March 2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/9/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
November 8, 2018 Filing 27 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/8/2018. The Court ordered the parties to meet and confer by 12/30/2018 regarding the reappointment of the DEA ALJ and whether this moots the Appointments Clause challenge. The Court ordered that each party submit an additional brief by 5:00 p.m. on 11/19/2018. It is further ordered that the parties may file optional reply briefs by 5:00 p.m. on 11/28/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
November 4, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (aty,Jones, Reid)
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA re #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (aty,Patil, Chetan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA. (aty,Patil, Chetan)
November 1, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: District Judge Status Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 03:00 PM by phone before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY denying as moot #2 Motion for an interim order. Telephone status conference is set for Thursday, 11/8/2018 at 3:00 pm by phone. Deadlines set in Court's minute entry 10/29/2018 Document #15 shall remain in place. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/1/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 1, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Morris & Dickson Co L L C of Entry of Order Staying Proceedings and Denying Government's Request for Interlocutory Appeal in DEA Administrative Action (aty,Jones, Reid)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Motgi on behalf of Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA (Attorney Anjali Motgi added to party Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III and USA(pty:dft)) (aty,Motgi, Anjali) Modified on 10/31/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 30, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Chetan Adinath Patil on behalf of Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA (Attorney Chetan Adinath Patil added to party Uttam Dhillon, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, U S Dept of Justice, Jefferson B Sessions, III, USA(pty:dft)) (aty,Patil, Chetan) Modified on 10/30/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 30, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Reid Allen Jones on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co L L C regarding #18 Affidavit of Service,. Action taken: service of the complaint on the Uttam Dhillon, Drug Enforcement Administration, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, and U.S. Department of Justice defendants are not complete; therefore answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 30, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Reid Allen Jones on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co L L C regarding #19 Affidavit of Service,. Action taken: service of the complaint on Uttam Dhillon, Drug Enforcement Administration, Jefferson B Sessions III and U.S. Department of Justice defendants are not complete; therefore answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Incomplete Service (Service is unexecuted) for Complaint, Summons, and Motion for Preliminary served on United States of America, through United States Attorney General Honorable Jefferson B. Sessions, III on October 30, 2018, filed by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Filings served on USA, #2 Exhibit 2-Certified mail receipt)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/30/2018 to indicate service is unexecuted (FinnSld, P).
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Incomplete Service (Service of unexecuted) for Complaint, Summons, and Motion for Preliminary served on Uttam Dhillon, Drug Enforcement Administration, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, and U.S. Department of Justice on October 30, 2018, filed by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/30/2018 to indicate service unexecuted (FinnSld, P).
October 30, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Reid Allen Jones on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co L L C regarding #17 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: service of the complaint on the USA defendant is not complete; therefore answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Incomplete Service (Service is unexecuted) for Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction served on United States of America, care of Honorable David Joseph, United States Attorney for Western District of Louisiana on October 29, 2018, filed by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Filings served on USA, #2 Exhibit 2-Certified mail receipt)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/30/2018 to indicate service is unexecuted (FinnSld, P).
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Jefferson B Sessions III, U S Dept of Justice, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, Uttam Dhillon (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants are to brief all issues, including venue and jurisdiction,related to Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction by 5:00 p.m. Thursday, 11/1/2018. Any response from Plaintiff is due by 5:00 p.m. on Sunday, 11/4/2018. In addition to filing in the record, counsel must submit courtesy copies to foote_motions@lawd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/29/2018. (crt,Reasor, M)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jodi L Avergun for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Joshua P Arnold for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Keith Michael Gerver for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael A Carvin for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William Nathan Simpson for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 29, 2018 REFUND of duplicate filing fee paid on 10/26/2018, Receipt #3791621, has been completed this date; counsel is requested to confirm this credit on the next credit card statement. (crt,Williams, C)
October 26, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Joshua P. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION for Jodi Levine Avergun to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 MOTION for William Nathan Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 MOTION for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 MOTION for Keith Michael Gerver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 26, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 26, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Jodi Levine Avergun to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3791741) by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Joshua P. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3791732) by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Keith Michael Gerver to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3791728) by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Michael A. Carvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3791723) by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for William Nathan Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3791715) by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morris & Dickson Co L L C identifying Corporate Parent Morris & Dickson Holding Co., LLC for Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (aty,Jones, Reid)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for an Interim Order, by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Interim Order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P). Added MOTION on 11/1/2018 (FinnSld, P).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Uttam Dhillon, in his offical capacity as acting administrator of the DEA, U S Drug Enforcement Administration, Jefferson B Sessions III, United States Department of Justice, United States of America (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3791637) filed by Morris & Dickson Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Morris & Dickson Co L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris & Dickson Co L L C v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Uttam Dhillon, in his offical capacity as acting administrator of the DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Anjali Motgi
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Represented By: Anjali Motgi
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uttam Dhillon
Represented By: Anjali Motgi
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Justice
Represented By: Anjali Motgi
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Anjali Motgi
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G Whitaker
Represented By: Anjali Motgi
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris & Dickson Co L L C
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Michael A Carvin
Represented By: Joshua P Arnold
Represented By: Jodi L Avergun
Represented By: Jeffrey R Johnson
Represented By: Keith Michael Gerver
Represented By: William Nathan Simpson
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?