Bareto v. U S Citizenship & Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Carine Bareto
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and U S Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 5:2018cv01530
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carine Bareto. U S Citizenship & Immigration Services served on 12/03/2018. Answer due date not set due to stay status. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(aty,Gahagan, Michael) Modified on 1/17/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/16/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings with consent sought but not yet obtained by U S Citizenship & Immigration Services. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Cristina Walker added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft))(aty,Walker, Cristina) Modified on 1/16/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to (Department of Homeland Security) U S Citizenship & Immigration Services. (crt,Putch, A)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services (crt,Putch, A)
November 23, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Putch, A)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Citizenship & Immigration Services (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3812869) filed by Carine Bareto. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ, #5 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Carine Bareto(pty:pla))(aty,Gahagan, Michael) Modified on 11/26/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bareto v. U S Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carine Bareto
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?