Marshall v. Cain
Plaintiff: Randy C Marshall
Defendant: N Burl Cain
Case Number: 5:2018cv01559
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to submit evidence of exhaustion of state court remedies. Pro Se Response due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/23/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/8/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy C Marshall. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Haik, K)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/26/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to Comply with #3 Memorandum Order by Randy C Marshall. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Cover Letter)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 28, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randy C Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibits, #4 Letter)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy C Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?