Franklin v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Renaldo Franklin
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv00027
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Terry A Doughty
1 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Renaldo Franklin, 4210 Greenwood Ln Apt 401, Shreveport, LA 71109, re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, returned marked: Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Renaldo Franklin, 4210 Greenwood Ln Apt 401, Shreveport, LA 71109, re: #5 Order to Strike, returned marked: Return to Sender. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Renaldo Franklin has neither refiled his application nor tendered payment of the filing fee. Accordingly, Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is stricken for failure to comply with the filing fee requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/13/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner is granted leave to filed his IFP application no later than 1/22/2019 and provide answers to all the questions on the application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/11/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renaldo Franklin. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 **STRICKEN** COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security filed by Renaldo Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Miletello, A) Modified on 2/14/2019 to reflect pleading as stricken per #5 Memorandum Order (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renaldo Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?