Mathews v. Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc
Plaintiff: William Jerry Matthews and William Jerry Mathews
Defendant: DALLAS ASSOCIATION, Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc and N A C M - Southwest
Case Number: 5:2019cv00210
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc. (aty,Carter, Pamela) Modified on 3/1/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/28/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Crick, S)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Pamela W Carter on behalf of Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/13/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
February 26, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
February 26, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed filed on 10/01/2018 in Case #609771, 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Louisiana. Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc answer due 3/5/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf image of attachment to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 2/27/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 26, 2019 Supplemental & Amending Petition for Damages against Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc filed by William Jerry Mathews on 8/27/2018 in Case #609771 in 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Louisiana. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf image of attachment to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Case Number 609771-b (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3885265) filed by Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Attorney Pamela W Carter added to party Dallas Association(pty:dft))(aty,Carter, Pamela) Modified on 2/27/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews v. Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jerry Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jerry Mathews
Represented By: Brent M Steier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALLAS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Association of Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Pamela W Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N A C M - Southwest
Represented By: Pamela W Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?