Phillips v. Exact Sciences et al
Plaintiff: Tina Phillips
Defendant: Andrew Stelly, Exact Sciences and Andrew Stell
Case Number: 5:2019cv00341
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Katelynn M Williams for Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Daniel A Kaplan for Exact Sciences,Daniel A Kaplan for Andrew Stell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/5/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Katelynn M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3963899) by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rahmn, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Daniel A. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3963889) by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rahmn, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 2 before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 7/19/2019. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 8/15/2019. Defendant's witness list is due seven (7) days after receiptof plaintiff's list. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 1/15/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 2/15/2020. Discovery deadline 11/29/2019. Compel discovery 11/29/2019. Expert Depositions due by 3/15/2020. Daubert Motions due by 4/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 4/3/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 4/17/2020. Motions in Limine due by 5/1/2020. Trial Depositions due by 5/26/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 6/8/2020. Electronic Exhibits due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/20/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/20/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The scheduling conference set for Monday, 5/20/19 at 11:00 will now be conducted by telephone. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/17/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell, Tina Phillips . (aty,Rahmn, Michael) Modified on 5/3/2019 to add filers. (Crick, S).
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO #4 REMOVAL ORDER by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed in error as 10 Notice. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 4/22/2019 to add document number. (Crick, S).
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Response to 4 Removal Order by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell. (aty,Rahmn, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/6/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 5/13/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/3/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Petition by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell.(aty,Rahmn, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2019 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency to Michael R Rahmn on behalf of Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell regarding #6 Answer to Complaint. Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form. (crt,Crick, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENT. ANSWER to Complaint by Exact Sciences, Andrew Stell.(aty,Rahmn, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2019 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 4/22/2019 to indicate #8 Answer resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/25/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/21/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exact Sciences in the First JDC, Parish of Caddo. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1, page 3, of the Notice of Removal, Doc. #1 . (crt,Mitchell, P)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exact Sciences. (aty,Rahmn, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 614820-A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3902291) filed by Andrew Stelly, Exact Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michael R Rahmn added to party Exact Sciences(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R Rahmn added to party Andrew Stelly(pty:dft))(aty,Rahmn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Exact Sciences et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Stelly
Represented By: Michael R Rahmn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exact Sciences
Represented By: Michael R Rahmn
Represented By: Daniel A Kaplan
Represented By: Katelynn M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Stell
Represented By: Daniel A Kaplan
Represented By: Michael R Rahmn
Represented By: Katelynn M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Phillips
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?