Asad v. Cissna et al
Plaintiff: Ammar Ahmad Asad
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, L. Francis Cissna and L Francis Cissna
Case Number: 5:2019cv00349
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1421c
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 5/26/2020 08:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1, before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 10:30 AM before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Pretrial Order due before noon on 4/16/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/2/2019. Witness List due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 12/15/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/15/2020. Discovery deadline 12/15/2019. Expert Depositions due by 2/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Daubert Motions due by 3/9/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 3/12/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 3/26/2020. Motions in Limine due by 4/9/2020. Trial Depositions due by 5/4/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/2/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/2/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone status conference has been set for 7/2/19 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss scheduling. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/28/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by L Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen.(aty,Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn) Modified on 5/24/2019 to edit filers (Putch, A).
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez on behalf of L Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen (Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party L Francis Cissna and Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft)) (aty,Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn) Modified on 5/17/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, L Francis Cissna, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Kirstjen Nielsen, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security (crt,Putch, A)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Matthew S Kriezelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ammar Ahmad Asad. FURTHERMORE, upon cause shown the requirement of local counsel is hereby waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/21/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
March 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Putch, A)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Matthew S Kriezelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, MOTION for Waiver under LR 83.2.7 ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3903574) by Ammar Ahmad Asad. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Kriezelman, Matthew). Modified on 3/20/2019 to capture all reliefs requested in pleading; Added MOTION for Waiver (Putch, A).
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ammar Ahmad Asad. (aty,Kriezelman, Matthew) Modified on 3/20/2019 to replace pdf with non-fillable form (Putch, A).
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Review of a Denial of an Application for Naturalizatoin under 8 USC 1421(c) against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3903564) filed by Ammar Ahmad Asad.(Attorney Matthew Scott Kriezelman added to party Ammar Ahmad Asad(pty:pla))(aty,Kriezelman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asad v. Cissna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ammar Ahmad Asad
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kriezelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?