Fleeks v. Vannoy

Plaintiff: David Fleeks
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 5:2019cv00483
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT; adopting #6 Report and Recommendations, denying and dismissing #1 Petition with prejudice as time-barred under 28 USC Sec 2244(d).Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/17/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/21/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)(a)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/23/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of David Fleeks in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635061424. (crt,Delgado, S)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 DUPLICATE COPIES of documents filed by David Fleeks; see document #1 (crt,Miletello, A)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Fleeks. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleeks v. Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fleeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?