Gibbs et al v. Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C

Plaintiff: Troy D Gibbs and Mary Johnson Gibbs
Defendant: Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00543
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/14/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint, with consent by Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kalmbach, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C. (aty,Kalmbach, John) Modified on 5/29/2019 to add Corporate Parents Comstock Oil & Gas Holdings Inc and Comstock Resources Inc (Dauterive, C).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint and #6 Amended Complaint. Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C's answer due 6/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/16/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/29/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Tucker Kalmbach added to party Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Kalmbach, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C filed by Troy D Gibbs, Mary Johnson Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(aty,O'Neal, Anna) Modified on 5/9/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D Gibbs, Mary Johnson Gibbs. Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (aty,O'Neal, Anna)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Enroll as Co-Counsel. Reid Allen Jones added as co-counsel for Mary Johnson Gibbs and Troy D Gibbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/2/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Reid A. Jones to Enroll as Counsel by Mary Johnson Gibbs, Troy D Gibbs. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Order on Motion to Enroll)(aty,O'Neal, Anna)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3935316) filed by Troy D Gibbs, Mary Johnson Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Anna W O'Neal added to party Mary Johnson Gibbs(pty:pla), Attorney Anna W O'Neal added to party Troy D Gibbs(pty:pla))(aty,O'Neal, Anna) Modified on 4/30/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs et al v. Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comstock Oil & Gas - Louisiana L L C
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Represented By: William Drew Burnham
Represented By: John Tucker Kalmbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy D Gibbs
Represented By: Anna W O'Neal
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Johnson Gibbs
Represented By: Anna W O'Neal
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?