Washington v. Prudential Insurance Co of America
Plaintiff: David M Washington
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Co of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00550
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby.), ( Compliance Deadline set for 6/28/2019, Discovery deadline 10/30/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/23/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Christopher M Busey for Prudential Insurance Co of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/13/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Christopher M Busey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3945792) by Prudential Insurance Co of America. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,LeBlanc, Patricia) Modified on 5/10/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Because this action is akin to one for review of an administrative record, the court finds that it is exempt from the initial disclosure requirements of Rule 26, and the parties are excused from filing a discovery plan/case management report. A telephone status conference will be held on May 23, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/2/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/1/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00030. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Case transferred to District of Western District of Louisiana. Before the Court is a Motion to Transfer Venue (Rec. Doc. 11) filed by Defendant, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Plaintiff, David M. Washington, filed a response (Rec. Doc. 12) stating that he consents to the transfer of this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. For the reasons stated in Defendant's unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue (Rec. Doc.11), IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/26/2019.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 03:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by David M. Washington re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Toledano, Reagan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Notice of Submission)(LeBlanc, Patricia) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America (LeBlanc, Patricia) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(LeBlanc, Patricia) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. Answer due 2/18/2019. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/24/2019. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patricia Schuster LeBlanc added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).(LeBlanc, Patricia) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Toledano, Reagan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7335921) filed by David M. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party David M. Washington(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/4/2019) (jeg). Modified text/attachment on 1/4/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Prudential Insurance Co of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Co of America
Represented By: Patricia S LeBlanc
Represented By: Christopher M Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Washington
Represented By: James F Willeford
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?