Brandon v. Vannoy

Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Petitioner: Dal-Duran Brandon
Case Number: 5:2019cv00636
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Dal-Duran Brandon. Response to Objection to R&R due by 7/10/2019 (crt,Haik, K)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)(a)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/21/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/21/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dal-Duran Brandon. (crt,Devillier, W)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dal-Duran Brandon. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibits, #4 Letter)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon v. Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dal-Duran Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?