C L H G-Acadian L L C et al v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Plaintiff: CLHG Minden LLC, CLHG Leesville, CLHG Avoyelles LLC, CLHG Ville Platte, LLC, Allegiance Health Center of Ruston, CLHG DeQuincy, Allegiance Health Center of Monroe, Sabine Medial Center, Bienville Medical Center, CLHG Oakdale LLC, Allegiance Health Management Inc, CLHG Winn LLC, CLHG-ACADIAN LLC, C L H G-Oakdale L L C, C L H G-Acadian L L C, Allegiance Health, C L H G-Avoyelles L L C, C L H G-Ville Platte L L C, C L H G-DeQuincy, C L H G-Winn L L C, C L H G-Leesville and C L H G-Minden L L C
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mallinckrodt P L C, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, McKesson Corp, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma L P, Actavis L L C, SPECGX LLC, Noramco Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Mallinckrodt L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Allergan P L C, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc and S P E C G X L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00756
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 101, directing transfer to Northern District of Ohio, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL # 2804. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-101) in MDL No.2804, IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (aty,Stein, Mark) Modified on 6/25/2019 to capture all filers (Putch, A).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Mark S Stein on behalf of Allegiance Health Center of Monroe, Allegiance Health Center of Ruston, Allegiance Health Management Inc, Bienville Medical Center, C L H G-Acadian L L C, C L H G-Avoyelles L L C, C L H G-DeQuincy, C L H G-Leesville, C L H G-Minden L L C, C L H G-Oakdale L L C, C L H G-Ville Platte L L C, C L H G-Winn L L C, Sabine Medial Center. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/2/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance L L C, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L P, S P E C G X L L C, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (crt,Putch, A)
June 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Putch, A)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Purdue Pharma L P, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Co Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Cephalon Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Noramco Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan P L C, Allergan Finance L L C, Watson Laboratories Inc, Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Mallinckrodt P L C, Mallinckrodt L L C, S P E C G X L L C, McKesson Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, Morris & Dickson Co L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3973300) filed by C L H G-Acadian L L C, Allegiance Health Center of Monroe, Allegiance Health Center of Ruston, C L H G-Avoyelles L L C, Bienville Medical Center, C L H G-Leesville, C L H G-Ville Platte L L C, C L H G-Minden L L C, C L H G-Oakdale L L C, Sabine Medial Center, C L H G-Winn L L C, C L H G-DeQuincy, Allegiance Health Management Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mark S Stein added to All Plaintiffs)(aty,Stein, Mark) Modified on 6/18/2019 to edit text/filers (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C L H G-Acadian L L C et al v. Purdue Pharma L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG Minden LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG Leesville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG Avoyelles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG Ville Platte, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiance Health Center of Ruston
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG DeQuincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiance Health Center of Monroe
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabine Medial Center
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bienville Medical Center
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG Oakdale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiance Health Management Inc
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG Winn LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLHG-ACADIAN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Oakdale L L C
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Acadian L L C
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiance Health
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Avoyelles L L C
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Ville Platte L L C
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-DeQuincy
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Winn L L C
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Leesville
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L H G-Minden L L C
Represented By: Lucien H Marioneaux, Jr
Represented By: Ralph R Alexis, III
Represented By: Mark S Stein
Represented By: Craig L Williams
Represented By: Glenn B Adams
Represented By: Michael R Allweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt P L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan P L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S P E C G X L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?