Raines v. George et al
Plaintiff: MD, JD Edward P Raines and Edward P Raines
Defendant: Henry R George, Royal Air, Inc., Richard Pennington, Glenn Adams, Vuelos Empresariales, S.A., Vuelos Empresariales S A, Richard Earl Pennington Delcore and Royal Air Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00770
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint with consent by Edward P Raines. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Exhibits, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rose, Jonathan) Modified on 8/15/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Leave of Absence of Alan Armstrong by Edward P Raines (aty,Rose, Jonathan) Modified on 8/14/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royal Air Inc. (aty,Keene, J)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Royal Air Inc, Glenn Adams.(Attorney J Ransdell Keene added to party Glenn Adams(pty:dft), Royal Air Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Keene, J) Modified on 8/5/2019 to modify docket text and remove third party complaint. (Crick, S).
August 5, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to J Ransdell Keene on behalf of Glenn Adams, Royal Air Inc regarding #12 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,. Action taken: Terminated #12 Third Party Demand erroneously selected at time of electronic filing. (crt,Crick, S)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Jonathan James Rose on behalf of Edward P Raines regarding #10 Affidavit of Service, #11 Affidavit of Service. Action taken: Set answer due date and docket text modified to indicate answer due date as pleading electronically filed in error as #10 Affidavit of Service, #11 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Crick, S)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Glenn Adams on 7/17/2019, filed by Edward P Raines. Glenn Adams answer due 8/7/2019. (aty,Rose, Jonathan) Modified on 7/19/2019 to modify docket text to indicate answer due date. (Crick, S).
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Royal Air Inc on 7/17/2019 filed by Edward P Raines. Royal Air Inc answer due 8/7/2019. (aty,Rose, Jonathan) Modified on 7/19/2019 to modify docket text to indicate answer due date. (Crick, S).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/17/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glenn Adams, Henry R George, Royal Air Inc, Vuelos Empresariales S A (crt,Crick, S)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Earl Pennington Delcore (crt,Crick, S)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Glenn Adams, Henry R George, Royal Air Inc, Vuelos Empresariales S A, Richard Earl Pennington Delcore filed by Edward P Raines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 14)(aty,Rose, Jonathan)
July 16, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glenn Adams, Henry R George, Royal Air Inc, Vuelos Empresariales S A, requested by Edward P Raines. (aty,Rose, Jonathan)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff will need to file his amended complaint no later than 7/17/2019, to establish that this court has diversity subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/26/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of E Alan Armstrong for Edward P Raines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/19/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glenn Adams, Henry R George, Richard Pennington, Royal Air Inc, Vuelos Empresariales S A (crt,Crick, S)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Alan Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3975682) by Edward P Raines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rose, Jonathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glenn Adams, Henry R George, Richard Pennington, Royal Air Inc, Vuelos Empresariales S A (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3975634) filed by Edward P Raines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails and Letter ref in Complaint, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jonathan James Rose added to party Edward P Raines(pty:pla))(aty,Rose, Jonathan) Modified on 6/19/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 18, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Alan Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3975682). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
June 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raines v. George et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry R George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Adams
Represented By: J Ransdell Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vuelos Empresariales, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vuelos Empresariales S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Earl Pennington Delcore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Air Inc
Represented By: J Ransdell Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD, JD Edward P Raines
Represented By: Jonathan James Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward P Raines
Represented By: Jonathan James Rose
Represented By: E Alan Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?