Kemp v. Belanger et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Kemp
Defendant: C Glass Bradley, Donald Belanger, Jr, Agent Albrecht, Agent Holly, Shreveport Police Dept, Ross Owens and Judge R Lee Irvin
Case Number: 5:2019cv00799
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Cameron Kemp in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 54635062177. (crt,Reasor, M)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that petitioner pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/9/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Albrecht, Donald Belanger, Jr, C Glass Bradley, Holly filed by Cameron Kemp.(crt,Haik, K)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shreveport Police Dept, Ross Owens, R Lee Irvin filed by Cameron Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(crt,Haik, K)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights complaint form)(crt,Miletello, A)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Deficiency to Cameron Kemp regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: No filing fee or IFP application received. (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified on 6/26/2019 to indicate deficiency was issued in error. IFP application received on 6/24/2019 (Haik, K).
June 26, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #2 Notice of Deficiency. Action taken: to indicate deficiency was issued in error. IFP application received on 6/24/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cameron Kemp. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Haik, K)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Albrecht, Donald Belanger, Jr, C Glass Bradley, Holly, Shreveport Police Dept filed by Cameron Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Haik, K)
June 21, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT? COMPLAINT against Albrecht, Donald Belanger, Jr, C Glass Bradley, Holly, Shreveport Police Dept filed by Cameron Kemp. Not on approved form (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A) Modified to add deficiency notation on 6/27/2019 (Haik, K).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Belanger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Glass Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Belanger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreveport Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge R Lee Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?