Bridges v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Marilyn F Bridges
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv00846
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David F Chermol for Marilyn F Bridges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/15/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3995866) by Marilyn F Bridges. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bordelon, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/8/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Marilyn F. Bridges by Marilyn F Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bordelon, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Marilyn F. Bridges against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Marilyn F Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons OGC, #3 Proposed Summons USAG, #4 Proposed Summons USAO)(Attorney Robert L Bordelon, Jr added to party Marilyn F Bridges(pty:pla))(aty,Bordelon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn F Bridges
Represented By: Robert L Bordelon, Jr
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?